U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHEATHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 11, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 08, 2024: [Factual Basis Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.