U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weathers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 14, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2024: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2024: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 08, 2024: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arrest]
  • October 08, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 08, 2024: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.