U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • May 08, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 08, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation of Facts to Jury]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 01, 2025: [Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice-other]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Suppress ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice-other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.