U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cr-00101-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Rabon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order to Surrender]
  • May 02, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 02, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 22, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 14, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arraignment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.