U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knight et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Seal ]
  • March 27, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 09, 2024: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2024: [Release Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.