U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coppedge et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Release Status Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.