U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castor, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 06, 2025: [Release Status Report]
  • May 06, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Bond Hearing ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.