U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00303-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BULLOCK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 24, 2025: [SEALED Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 05, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Related Case]
  • October 09, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 09, 2024: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 08, 2024: [Oral Motion]
  • October 08, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.