U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00279-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARKHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 08, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.