U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TROUTMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 07, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • March 14, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 08, 2024: [SEALED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.