U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00128-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Chacon-Landaverde et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 08, 2024: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 08, 2024: [Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.