U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00060-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Burgueno-Luna et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.