U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fair, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Accepting Plea]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 09, 2024: [Factual Basis]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.