U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Freeman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 08, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.