U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rountree
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 22, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order to Surrender]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 12, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.