U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 09, 2024: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 09, 2024: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 09, 2024: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.