U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lynch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice-other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.