U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 12, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • May 12, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Release Status Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for revocation of pretrial release ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2025
  • January 11, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Release Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.