U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00162-2
  • Case Name: USA v. CASTANEDA-GRATEROL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 13, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 13, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.