U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Orr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 23, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 25, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue Other]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.