U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Currie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 12, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Claim]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 10, 2024: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 10, 2024: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 09, 2024: [Factual Basis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.