U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00060-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Geiger et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 11, 2024: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.