U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00267-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Lyons et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.