U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 12, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Service by Publication]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.