U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2024: [Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arrest ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.