U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00002-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 05, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Objection to PSI]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.