U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00007-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Shipman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Proposed Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Referred]
  • October 09, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.