U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Seal ]
  • April 25, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 24, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 21, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2024
  • November 06, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.