U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stephenson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
December, 2024
  • December 22, 2024: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.