U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 01, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.