U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lynch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [USCA Order]
April, 2025
  • April 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing ]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.