U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00008-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.