U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IRELAND
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • May 06, 2025: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 06, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice-Other]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2024: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 09, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Related Case]
  • October 09, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Oral Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.