U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00334-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FENDERSON, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motions No Longer Submitted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 24, 2025: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.