U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THEOPHILAKOS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Probation Petition Amended 12C/Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 07, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.