U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALVARADO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 21, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 12, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.