U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00033-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Wolfe, et.al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 10, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 25, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 25, 2025: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.