U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00390-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 02, 2025: [Notice-other]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [SEALED Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.