U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whittlesey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.