U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hines et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • March 05, 2025: [Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.