U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00029-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Little et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 07, 2025: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.