U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00306-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Silva et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [RESTRICTED Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.