U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salvant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Docket Call]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Release Status Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.