U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stevenson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 30, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 30, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.