U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pinnock et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Courtroom Technology Certification of Training]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Seal ]
  • April 04, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.