U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medlin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 12, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
  • April 12, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 19, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.