U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00189-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Desire
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Pretrial Memorandum ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.