U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00386-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Selby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 24, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 10, 2025: [In Limine ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.