U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rizo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 10, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.