U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Suppress ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 24, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.